Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 18, 2022
Fiscal Note April 6, 2022
Bill March 25, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2022

Amended

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022