Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 18, 2022
Fiscal Note April 18, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill April 27, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022