Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB202 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 4, 2022
Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 29, 2022
Fiscal Note April 19, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill April 26, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 10, 2022