Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 22, 2022
Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 20, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 7, 2022