Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note April 21, 2022
Bill April 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 30, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022