Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill April 29, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 10, 2022