Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 23, 2023
Fiscal Note January 20, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill January 31, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 27, 2023

Amended

Bill March 9, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023