Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1020 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Fiscal Note March 16, 2023
Fiscal Note January 24, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023