Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1060 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/03/2023

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
on Second Reading in the Second House
LLS NO. 23-0144.01 Sarah Lozano x3858
HOUSE BILL 23-1060
House Committees Senate Committees
Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Agriculture & Natural Resources
Appropriations Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING UPDATES TO THE COLORADO STATE FOREST SERVICE101
SEEDLING TREE 
NURSERY, AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH ,102
MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .103
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Wildfire Matters Review Committee. The bill requires the
Colorado state forest service to make certain upgrades and improvements
to its seedling tree nursery in order to expand its capacity and its ability
to contribute to reforestation efforts in the state. The general assembly is
required to appropriate money to the Colorado state university system for
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
May 3, 2023
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
April 11, 2023
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
April 10, 2023
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Story, Lynch, Amabile, Bird, Boesenecker, Brown, deGruy Kennedy, Dickson, English,
Froelich, Hamrick, Herod, Jodeh, Lieder, Lindsay, Lindstedt, Lukens, Marshall, Martinez,
McCluskie, McCormick, McLachlan, Michaelson Jenet, Sirota, Snyder, Soper, Velasco,
Weinberg, Young
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Cutter, Danielson, Jaquez Lewis
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. the 2023-24 state fiscal year for allocation to the state forest service.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-31-319, amend2
(6) and (8); and add (2.5), (3.5), and (4.5) as follows:3
23-31-319.  Forest service seedling tree nursery - necessary4
upgrades and improvements - definition - funding - reports - repeal.5
(2.5)  Field upgrades. T
O UPGRADE THE FIELDS WHERE THE NURSERY6
GROWS BARE-ROOT TREES AND SHRUBS, THE NURSERY SHALL:7
(a)  I
NSTALL A NEW PUMP AND PUMP HOUSE ;8
(b)  O
VERHAUL THE IRRIGATION SYSTEM ; AND9
(c)  G
RADE AND IMPROVE THE ROADS TO AND WITHIN THE FIELDS .10
(3.5)  Seed storage cooler. T
O IMPROVE THE CAPACITY, SECURITY,11
AND ENERGY EFFICIENCY OF SEED STORAGE , THE NURSERY SHALL12
PURCHASE A NEW SEED STORAGE COOLER .13
(4.5)  Delivery trucks. T
O IMPROVE THE TIMELINESS OF14
DELIVERIES AND ELIMINATE THE COST OF RENTING DELIVERY TRUCKS , THE15
NURSERY SHALL PURCHASE TWO REFRIGERATED BOX TRUCKS .16
(6) Appropriation. For the 2022-23 AND 2023-24 state fiscal year17
YEARS, the general assembly shall appropriate money to the Colorado18
state university system for allocation to and expenditure by the Colorado19
state forest service to fund improvements to the nursery, to hire20
professional staff, and to conduct the capacity, expertise, and21
infrastructure analysis as specified in subsection (5) of this section FOR22
THE PURPOSES SPECIFIED IN THIS SECTION. ANY MONEY APPROPRIATED BY23
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION (6) THAT IS NOT24
EXPENDED BEFORE THE END OF THE FISCAL YEAR FOR WHICH IT IS25
1060-2- APPROPRIATED REMAINS AVAILABLE FOR EXPENDITURE FOR THE SAME1
PURPOSES UNTIL THE CLOSE OF THE 2024-25 STATE FISCAL YEAR.2
(8)  Repeal. This section is repealed, effective January 1, 20253
2026.4
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-3.3-103, add (12)5
as follows:6
23-3.3-103. Annual appropriations - repeal. (12) (a) THE7
PROVISIONS OF SUBSECTION (1) OF THIS SECTION CONCERNING8
APPROPRIATIONS FOR STUDENT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE UNDER THIS9
ARTICLE 3.3 DO NOT APPLY TO APPROPRIATIONS MADE PURSUANT TO10
SECTION 23-31-319 TO FUND IMPROVEMENTS TO THE COLORADO STATE11
FOREST SERVICE SEEDLING TREE NURSERY .12
(b) THIS SUBSECTION (12) IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2026.13
SECTION 3. In Session Laws of Colorado 2022, amend section14
3 of chapter 434 (HB22-1323) as follows:15
Section 3. Appropriation. For the 2022-23 state fiscal year,16
$5,000,000 is appropriated to the department of higher education for use17
by the board of governors of the Colorado state university system. This18
appropriation is from the general fund. To implement this act, the board19
of governors may use this appropriation for the Colorado state forest20
service tree nursery. Any money appropriated in this section not expended21
prior to July 1, 2023, is further appropriated to the board of governors for22
the 2023-24 AND 2024-25 state fiscal year YEARS for the same purpose.23
SECTION 4.  Appropriation. For the 2023-24 state fiscal year,24
$5,382,500 is appropriated to the department of higher education for use25
by the board of governors of the Colorado state university system. This26
appropriation is from the general fund. To implement this act, the board27
1060
-3- of governors may use this appropriation for the Colorado state forest1
service tree nursery.2
SECTION 5. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act3
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the4
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except5
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V6
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this7
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take8
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in9
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the10
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.11
1060
-4-