Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 5, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note January 18, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Amended

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023