Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note January 27, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 9, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2023

Amended

Bill March 2, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023