Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1123 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note February 8, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 15, 2023

Amended

Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023