03/31/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
03/23/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2023 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |