Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note February 14, 2023
Bill February 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023

Amended

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023