Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Amended

Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023