06/07/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |