Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 29, 2023
Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 7, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023