Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1199 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 6, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Amended

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023