Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1201 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/20/2023

                    Page 1 
June 20, 2023  HB 23-1201  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0773  
Rep. Daugherty; Soper 
Sen. Mullica; Smallwood 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 20, 2023 
Signed into Law  
Kristine McLaughlin | 303-866-4776 
kristine.mclaughlin@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: RX DRUG BENEFITS CONTRACT TERM REQUIREMENTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Diversion 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill limits the amount that carriers or pharmacy benefit managers (PBMs) may 
charge beneficiaries of employer-sponsored plans for prescription drugs to no more 
than the amount paid by the plan to contracted pharmacies, and specifies enforcement 
mechanisms.  The bill increases state expenditures and may increase state revenue 
on an ongoing basis. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $10,000 to the 
Department of Regulatory Agencies. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1201 
 
  
Budget Year  
FY 2023-24  
Out Year  
FY 2024-25  
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Out Year  
FY 2026-27  
Revenue 
 
-        -        -        -        
Expenditures Cash Funds $10,000  -  -  $250,000  
Total Expenditures $10,000   - - $250,000   
Diversion General Fund ($10,000)    - - ($250,000)     
 	Cash Funds $10,000 - - $250,000     
 	Net Diversion $0 - - $0 
Other Budget  - - - - 
 
    Page 2 
June 20, 2023  HB 23-1201  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill limits the amount that health insurance carriers or pharmacy benefit managers (PBMs) may 
charge beneficiaries of select employer-sponsored plans for prescription drugs to no more than the 
amount paid by the plan or PBM to a contracted pharmacy.  The bill applies to select contracts issued 
or renewed on or after January 1, 2025.  The bill grants audit authority to the Department of Health 
Care Policy and Financing (HCPF) for Medicaid contractors and the Department of Regulatory 
Agencies (DORA) for all other contracts.  Failure to comply a deceptive trade practice in the business 
of insurance. 
State Revenue 
Civil penalties.  A person committing a deceptive trade practice in the business of insurance may be 
subject to a civil penalty of up to $3,000 for each act, with potentially higher penalties for willful or 
repeat violations, up to a maximum annual penalty specified in statute. Given that insurers are 
assumed to comply with the requirements of the bill, and the wide range in potential penalty amounts 
in any cases that are pursued by the commissioner, the fiscal note cannot estimate the potential impact 
of these civil penalties.  Penalty revenue is deposited into the General Fund and subject to TABOR. 
 
Filing fees.  The bill may increase revenue to the Judicial Department from an increase in civil case 
filings to appeal deceptive trade practice actions taken by the Division of Insurance in DORA.  
Revenue from filing fees is subject to TABOR. 
State Diversions  
This bill diverts $10,000 from the General Fund in FY 2023-24 and $250,000 in FY 2026-27.  This revenue 
diversion occurs because the bill increases costs in the Department of Regulatory Agencies, Division 
of Insurance, which is funded with premium tax revenue that would otherwise be credited to the 
General Fund.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases costs in DORA by $10,000 in FY 2023-24 and $250,000 in FY 2026-27 and ongoing. 
These expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. The bill also increases workload for 
HCPF and the Judicial Department. These impacts are discussed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1201 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 
Contractor (DORA) $10,000   -   -   $250,000   
Total Costs 	$10,000   -   -   $250,000   
 
   Page 3 
June 20, 2023  HB 23-1201  
 
 
Department of Regulatory Agencies.  DORA will hire a contractor to perform the data collection, 
storage, and analysis process necessary to conduct the audits required by the bill.  This contractor will 
perform work required for both HCPF and DORA. The contractor will send results to the appropriate 
department. It is assumed that DORA will require 40 contractor hours in FY 2023-24 for technical 
assistance relating to rule promulgation and 1,000 hours in FY 2026-27 and ongoing to assist in audits.  
 
Department of Health Care Policy and Financing.  HCPF will have an increase in workload to 
promulgate rules, perform outreach with Managed Care Organizations (MCOs) that contract with a 
PBM, and to receive and respond to consumer complaints and audit findings.  Since only two MCOs 
are affected by the bill, it is assumed that workload for enforcement actions regarding deceptive trade 
practices can be accomplished within existing resources. 
Judicial Department.  The trial courts in the Judicial Department may have an increase in cases filed 
from the addition of a new deceptive trade practice.  It is assumed that health insurers will have a 
high level of compliance with the law and that any violation of the legislation will result in minimal 
number of new cases reviewed by the courts.  Thus, no change in appropriations is required. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on May 10, 2023, and takes effect on August 7, 2023, 
assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $10,000 from the Division of 
Insurance Cash Fund to the Department of Regulatory Agencies.   
State and Local Government Contacts 
District Attorneys Health Care Policy and Financing Information Technology 
Judicial  Law  Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.