Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 20, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Amended

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023