Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 10, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023