Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1268 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 27, 2023
Fiscal Note April 7, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2023

Amended

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023