Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1277 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 18, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023

Amended

Bill May 6, 2023