Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1281 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Amended

Bill May 6, 2023