Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1291 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note April 19, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023