Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1296 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/20/2023

                    Page 1 
April 20, 2023  HB 23-1296  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-1005  
Rep. Ortiz; Herod 
 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 20, 2023 
House State Affairs 
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
josh.abram@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: CREATE TASK FORCE STUDY RIGHTS PERSONS DISA BILITIES   
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a task force and four subcommittees to study issues concerning 
persons with disabilities. The bill increases state expenditures in FY 2023-24 and 
FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $289,568 to the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1296 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$289,568  	$128,709  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$28,291  	$14,952  
 
Total Expenditures 	$317,859  	$143,661  
 	Total FTE 	1.5 FTE  	0.8 FTE  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$43,435  	$19,306  
 
 
    Page 2 
April 20, 2023  HB 23-1296  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Task Force on the Rights of Coloradans with Disabilities in the Colorado Civil 
Rights Division (CCRD) in the Department of Regulatory Agencies (DORA). The task force is 
comprised of at least 15 members, including the Lieutenant Governor, representatives from disability 
rights advocacy organizations, legal experts, DORA, CCRD, the Department of Local Affairs (DOLA), 
the Office of Economic Development and International Trade (OEDIT), and the Office of State 
Planning and Budgeting (OSPB).    
 
The task force must be appointed by August 1, 2023.  No later than August 30, 2023, the task force 
must create four issue subcommittees to separately study and report findings concerning issues 
related to persons with disabilities.  Based on reports from the subcommittees, the task force must 
produce a final report and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly before 
January 30, 2025.   
 
The CCRD may employ 1.5 FTE to provide administrative support, and contract with a professional 
facilitator to assist with operations of the task force and subcommittees.  Task force members and 
subcommittee members who are not representing governmental entities may receive per diem and be 
reimbursed for actual and necessary expenses incurred. 
 
The bill creates the following issue subcommittees: 
  
 the Subcommittee on the Rewrite and Modernization of the Colorado Revised Statutes Concerning 
the Civil Rights of Persons with Disabilities (rewrite committee); 
 the Subcommittee on Basic Access to the Colorado Outdoors for Persons with Disabilities 
(outdoors committee); 
 the Subcommittee on the Affordability, Accessibility, and Attainability of Housing for Persons 
with Disabilities (housing subcommittee); and,  
 the Subcommittee on Physical and Programmatic Basic Access within State and Local Government 
for Persons with Disabilities (government subcommittee). 
 
The rewrite committee must report to the task force by December 1, 2023.  The other subcommittee 
reports must be made by December 1, 2024. The task force and subcommittees are repealed 
June 30, 2025. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in DORA by $280,101 in FY 2023-24 and $134,265 in FY 2024-25, 
paid from the General Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
   Page 3 
April 20, 2023  HB 23-1296  
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1296 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Regulatory Agencies   
Personal Services 	$125,595  $65,533  
Operating Expenses 	$2,025  $1,080 
Capital Outlay Costs 	$13,340  	- 
Professional Facilitation 	$100,000  $50,000  
Member Compensation 	$48,608 
$48,608 
$12,096  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$28,291  $14,952  
Total Cost $317,859  $143,661  
Total FTE 1.5 FTE 0.8 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Personal services. In FY 2023-24, DORA will add 1.0 FTE policy specialist and 0.5 FTE administrative 
assistant to support the task force and subcommittees.  In FY 2024-25, personal service costs represent 
a half-year impact, since the subcommittees and task force must finalize recommendations by 
January 2025.  Personal service costs include standard operating expenses and capital outlay costs.   
 
Professional facilitation. The CCRD will contract with a professional facilitator to help conduct all 
task force and subcommittee meetings, and to draft final reports and recommendations.  The contact 
is estimated to be $100,000 in FY 2023-24, and $50,000 for one half year in FY 2024-25.  
 
Task force and subcommittee member compensation. The bill provides that members of the task 
force not representing a governmental agency receive per diem allowance.  Per diem is calculated at 
$112, the current per diem rate for state legislators.  This fiscal note assumes that the rewrite committee 
only meets in FY 2023-24, and that the task force and other subcommittees meet monthly through 
December 2024. No expenses are included in this estimate as meetings are assumed to occur remotely.  
If actual and necessary expenses occur for members, the CCRC must seek additional funds during the 
budget process. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
 
Other state agencies. State agency representatives from the Lieutenant Governor’s Office, DOLA, 
DORA, CCRC, OEDIT, and OSPB must participate as task force members.  This is estimated to equate 
to about $11,000, and .1 FTE for each affected agency; however, this increase does not rise to the level 
of requiring new appropriations.  If any of the impacted agencies experience an increase in workload 
in excess of .1 FTE, resources must be sought during the annual budget setting process.   
  Page 4 
April 20, 2023  HB 23-1296  
 
Governor’s office of boards and commissions.  The governor’s office of Boards and Commissions 
spends about 8.5 hours researching and communicating with potential appointees.  This bill requires 
the Governor to appoint approximately 35 task force and subcommittee members, equating to about 
$11,000 and .1 FTE; however, this increase does not rise to the level of requiring new appropriations.  
Should the Governor’s office efforts exceed this estimate, resources must be sought during the annual 
budget setting process. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $289,568 to the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies, and 1.5 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Governor's Office  Local Affairs      Economic Development  
Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.