Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 1, 2023
Fiscal Note April 20, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023