Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note January 11, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023