Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB016 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023
Fiscal Note February 14, 2023
Fiscal Note January 23, 2023
Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Amended

Bill April 30, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023