Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 25, 2023
Fiscal Note March 1, 2023
Fiscal Note February 9, 2023
Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Amended

Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023