|
06/02/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee on Refer Unamended to Legislative Council
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
|
|
|