Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB094 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 18, 2023
Fiscal Note February 7, 2023
Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Amended

Bill April 22, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023