03/23/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
03/13/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/13/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |