06/02/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/15/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/29/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |