Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB132 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 23-0390.01 Carolyn Kampman x4959
SENATE BILL 23-132
Senate Committees House Committees
Appropriations Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING A SUPPLEMENTAL APPR OPRIATION TO THE DEPARTMENT101
OF STATE.102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
Supplemental appropriations are made to the department of state.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 16, 2023
HOUSE
    2nd Reading Unamended
February 15, 2023
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 9, 2023
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
February 8, 2023
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Zenzinger, Bridges, Kirkmeyer
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Bird, Sirota, Bockenfeld, Bacon, Herod, Joseph, Lieder, Lindsay, Lindstedt, Mabrey,
McCluskie, Michaelson Jenet, Parenti, Snyder, Velasco, Young
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. SECTION 1.  Appropriation to the department of state for the1
fiscal year beginning July 1, 2022. In Session Laws of Colorado 2022,2
section 2 of chapter 507, (HB 22-1329), amend Part XXI and the affected3
totals, as Part XXI (1) and the affected totals are amended by section 214
of chapter 170, (HB 22-1133), as follows: 5
Section 2. Appropriation.6
132
-2- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
PART XXI	1
DEPARTMENT OF STATE	2
3
(1) ADMINISTRATION DIVISION	4
Personal Services	5 2,173,615
6 (21.1 FTE)
Health, Life, and Dental	7 1,740,831
Short-term Disability	8 19,091
S.B. 04-257 Amortization	9
Equalization Disbursement	10 596,581
S.B. 06-235 Supplemental	11
Amortization Equalization	12
Disbursement	13 596,581
Salary Survey	14 392,180
PERA Direct Distribution	15 282,593
132
-3- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
Temporary Employees	1
Related to Authorized Leave	2 6,330
Workers' Compensation	3 75,482
Operating Expenses	4 454,000
Legal Services	5 877,423
Outside legal services	6 25,000
Administrative Law Judge	7
Services	8 71,968
Payment to Risk	9
Management and Property	10
Funds 11 262,320
Vehicle Lease Payments	12 10,144
Leased Space	13 1,303,579
Payments to OIT	14 367,231
15 292,397
132
-4- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
CORE Operations	1 23,056
Electronic Recording	2
Technology Board	3 3,599,556
Indirect Cost Assessment	4 259,249
Discretionary Fund	5 5,000
6 13,141,810
13,141,810
a
7 13,066,976 13,066,976
a
8
a
 Of this amount, $9,542,254
 $9,467,420 shall be from the Department of State Cash Fund created in Section 24-21-104 (3)(b), C.R.S., and $3,599,556(I) shal	l be from the Electronic	9
Recording Technology Fund created in Section 24-21-404 (1)(a), C.R. S., which is shown for informational purposes only because i t is continuously appropriated.	10
11
(2) INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY DIVISION	12
Personal Services	13 6,618,663
14 (46.0 FTE)
Operating Expenses	15 503,724
132
-5- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
Hardware/Software	1
Maintenance	2 2,636,625
Information Technology	3
Asset Management	4 445,418
5 10,204,430 151,651 9,595,430
a
457,349
b
6
a
 This amount shall be from the Department of State Cash Fund created in Section 24-21-104 (3)(b), C.R.S.	7
b 
Of this amount, $259,249 shall be from statewide indirect cost recoveries from the Department of State and $198,100 shall be fr	om the Indirect Costs Excess Recovery Fund created	8
in Section 24-75-1401 (2), C.R.S.	9
10
(3) ELECTIONS DIVISION	11
Personal Services	12 3,109,679 3,109,679
a
13(39.7 FTE)
Operating Expenses	14 340,100 340,100
a
132
-6- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
Help America Vote Act	1
Program 2 10,000 10,000(I)
b
Local Election	3
Reimbursement
110
4 3,200,000 3,200,000
a
Initiative and Referendum	5 165,000 165,000
a
Document Management	6 670,811 670,811
a
7 7,495,590
8
a
 These amounts shall be from the Department of State Cash Fund created in Section 24-21-104 (3)(b), C.R.S.	9
b
 This amount shall be from the Federal Elections Assistance Fund created in Section 1-1.5-106 (1)(a), C.R.S., which is shown fo	r informational purposes because it is continuously	10
appropriated to the Department of State for the implementation of the federal Help America Vote Act of 2002, pursuant to Sectio	n 1-1.5-106 (2)(b), C.R.S. Appropriations from the Federal	11
Elections Assistance Fund do not constitute fiscal year spending fo r the purposes of Section 20 of Article X of the State Const itution.	12
13
14
15
132
-7- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
(4) BUSINESS AND LICENSING DIVISION	1
Personal Services	2 2,687,041
3 (38.7 FTE)
Operating Expenses	4 126,380
Business Intelligence Center	5
Personal Services 	6 631,881
7 (1.0 FTE)
Business Intelligence Center	8
Operating Expenses	9 150,000
10 3,595,302 3,595,302
a
11
a
 This amount shall be from the Department of State Cash Fund created in Section 24-21-104 (3)(b), C.R.S. 	12
13
14
15
132
-8- APPROPRIATION FROM
ITEM &
SUBTOTAL
TOTAL GENERAL
FUND
GENERAL
FUND
EXEMPT
CASH
FUNDS
REAPPROPRIATED
FUNDS
FEDERAL
FUNDS
$$$$$ $ $
TOTALS PART XXI	1
(STATE) 2 $34,437,132
$151,651 $33,828,132
a
$457,349
3 $34,362,298 $33,753,298
a
4
a
 Of this amount, $3,609,556 contains an (I) notation.	5
6
FOOTNOTES -- The following statements are referenced to the numbered footnotes throughout section 2.	7
8
110 Department of State, Elections Division , Local Election Reimbursement -- If actual reimbursements to counties required by se	ction 1-5-505.5, C.R.S., exceed	9
the cash funds amount specified in this line item, the Department may spend up to 115.0 percent of the cash funds amount specif	ied to make the required	10
reimbursements.	11
132
-9- SECTION 2.  Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,1
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate2
preservation of the public peace, health, and safety.3
132-10-