LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB144
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB144
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB144
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 30, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 23, 2023
Fiscal Note
February 21, 2023
Bill
February 8, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 11, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 8, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 25, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 13, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 12, 2023
Compare