Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Fiscal Note February 17, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 7, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023