Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB167 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 5, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2023

Amended

Bill April 26, 2023