Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 24, 2023
Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill March 26, 2023