Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill March 27, 2023
Bill March 26, 2023