Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB176 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/26/2023

                    Page 1 
April 26, 2023  SB 23-176  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated March 20, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0473  
Sen. Moreno; Cutter 
Rep. deGruy Kennedy 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 26, 2023 
House Public & Behavioral Health 
Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 
shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PROTECTIONS FOR PEOPLE WITH AN EATING DISORDER  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates prohibitions and requirements related to health care services for 
individuals with disordered eating.  The bill minimally increases state expenditures 
beginning in FY 2023-24.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill.   
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates prohibitions and requirements related to health care services for individuals with 
disordered eating, including: 
 
 prohibiting Medicaid, starting July 1, 2023, and health insurance plans, starting January 1, 2024, 
from using body mass index, ideal body weight, or any achieved weight standard to determine 
medical need or the level of care for individuals with disordered eating; and 
 prohibiting retail establishments from selling over-the-counter diet pills to individuals under 
18-years-old without prescriptions, with rules to be created by the State Board of Pharmacy within 
the Department of Regulatory Agencies (DORA).  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state workload for DORA and the Department of Health Care Policy and Financing 
beginning in FY 2023-24, as discussed below.  
 
    Page 2 
April 26, 2023  SB 23-176  
 
 
Department of Regulatory Agencies.  Workload in the Division of Insurance and the State Board of 
Pharmacy, both located within DORA, will increase by a minimal amount starting in FY 2023-24.  
Specifically, these divisions will need to update rules, conduct outreach with health insurance carriers 
and retail establishments, and respond to consumer inquiries and complaints.  It is assumed that this 
work can be accomplished within existing appropriations. 
 
Department of Health Care Policy and Financing.  Any impact from the prohibition on using certain 
metrics to determine medical necessity is anticipated to have a minimal effect on the number of 
Medicaid members with disordered eating from being admitted and discharged from residential 
facilities, or the length of time members stay in such facilities.  Any changes in utilization will be 
addressed through the annual budget process. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature, 
except the requirement for health benefit plans takes effect on January 1, 2024, and the requirement 
on retail establishments takes effect July 1, 2024.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Behavioral Health Administration  Corrections          
Health Care Policy and Financing  Higher Education  
Human Services        Information Technology 
Law  Public Health and Environment 
Regulatory Agencies  Revenue 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.