Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 7, 2023
Fiscal Note April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2023

Amended

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023