Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 7, 2023
Fiscal Note March 10, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Amended

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023