Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 26, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2023
Bill March 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023