04/21/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
04/11/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/11/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/01/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |