Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note April 12, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023

Amended

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023