|
05/01/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
04/21/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
|
04/12/2023
|
First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
|
|
|