06/05/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/17/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |