Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 8, 2023

Amended

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023