05/17/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/08/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 04/29/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |